MS SB2159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 19-21-105, 41-61-57, 41-61-63, 41-61-77, 45-1-2, 45-1-25, 45-1-29, 45-1-31, 45-33-23, 45-33-35, 45-33-37, 57-21-9, 63-11-5, 63-11-8, 63-11-13, 63-11-19, 63-11-32, 63-11-47 And 99-39-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Identify The State's Primary Criminal Examination, Research And Analysis Laboratory Designed For The Detection And Investigation Of Crime As The Mississippi Forensics Laboratory; To Amend Section 99-49-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 257, 2015 Regular Session, To Conform; To Amend Section 41-29-176, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Advertising For The Administrative Forfeiture Of Property Under The Controlled Substances Act; To Amend Section 2, Chapter 484, Laws Of 2013, As Amended By Section 5, Chapter 501, Laws Of 2014, To Extend The Repeal Date On Section 41-29-176; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Crime Lab; rename "Mississippi Forensics Laboratory" and extend Bureau of Narcotics' authority to advertise forfeitures online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Gipson,Campbell,White |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Clarke,Longwitz |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Byrd, Gipson, Campbell) |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |