MS SB2193 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-15-97, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Privilege License Tax Upon Each Person, Company, Firm Or Association Engaged In The Business Of Adjusting Insured Losses; To Amend Section 83-17-401, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "workers' Compensation Adjuster" As Used In The Article Which Provides For The Licensing Of Insurance Adjusters; To Amend Section 83-17-415, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Continuing Education Requirements For Insurance Adjusters; To Amend Section 83-17-419, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Change The License Period To A Biennial Issuance And Renewal Period; To Amend Section 83-17-513, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Continuing Education Requirements For Public Adjusters; To Amend Section 83-17-517, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Change The License Period To A Biennial Issuance And Renewal Period For Public Adjusters; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance adjusters/public adjusters; revise licensing and continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-14 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Chism,Touchstone,Formby |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Carmichael,Browning,Kirby |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Amended |
2016-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-16 | House | DR - TSDP: GB To IN |
2016-03-15 | House | DR - TSDP: IN To GB |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Insurance;Revenue and Expenditure General Bills |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-10 | Senate | DR - TSDP: IN To AC |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |