MS SB2449 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of The Mississippi Veterinary Association; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Dyslexia Awareness Motor Vehicle License Tag; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag With The Word "don't Tread On Me" Imprinted Thereon; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of Jackson Academy; To Provide For The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of Le Bonheur Children's Hospital; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Abbie Rogers Civitan Camp; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of The Animal Rescue League Of Laurel; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of The Farm Families Of Mississippi; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of Brookhaven Academy; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag Honoring Ronald Reagan, Fortieth President Of The United States, And His Many Outstanding Accomplishments; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag For Supporters Of Jackson Preparatory School; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag With The Words "we Love Life" Imprinted Thereon; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of Such Fees; To Authorize The Issuance Of A Special License Tag For Trailers Primarily Designed For The Transport Of Horses To Supporters Of The Mississippi State Equine Association; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fees Collected; To Amend Section 27-19-44, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make It Clear That Distinctive License Tags Issued For School Districts Under Section 27-19-56.154 Are Exempt From The Time Limit For Submitting Proof That At Least 300 Of Such License Tags Or Plates Will Be Purchased And Deposit With The Department An Amount Necessary To Purchase 300 Of Such License Tags Or Plates; To Amend Section 27-19-56.154, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 27-19-56.108, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Rotary International; To Amend Section 27-19-56.133, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Issuance Of A Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag To Supporters Of The Boys And Girls Clubs Rather Than Supporters Of The Mississippi Alliance For Boys And Girls Clubs And To Reauthorize The Issuance Of The Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag Authorized By This Section; To Amend Section 27-19-56.216, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Distinctive Tag Authorized Under This Section Shall Be Issued To Supporters Of The Laurel School District; To Revise The Words Required To Be Displayed On The Tag; To Provide That The Additional Fee Collected On The Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag Issued Under This Section Shall Be Distributed To The Laurel School District; To Amend Section 27-19-48, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Issuance Of Personalized License Tags For Noncommercial Trailers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive motor vehicle license tag; authorize for supporters of the Mississippi Veterinary Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Died On Calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2011-02-07 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-12 | Referred To Finance |