MS SB2477 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-20-9, 43-20-11, 43-20-14 And 43-20-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Impose Certain Standards Relative To The Licensure Of Child Care Facilities, To Provide Certain Complaint Procedures, To Provide Certain Notice Requirements Prior To License Disciplinary Action; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child care facility licensure by the State Department of Health; provide certain standards and restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2014-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Howell,Hines |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |