MS SB2477 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Section 27-7-22.42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Qualified Railroad Reconstruction Or Replacement Expenditures And Qualified New Rail Infrastructure Expenditures, And Which Was Repealed By Operation Of Law On January 1, 2024; To Amend Reenacted Section 27-7-22.42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; reenact and extend repealer on credit for certain railroad expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |