MS SB2501 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For The Transfer Of Coahoma Agricultural High School To The Coahoma Community College District For Use As An Early College High School For The Students Of Coahoma County Subject To The Approval Of The State Board Of Education; To Provide For The Transfer Of Real Property To The Coahoma School District; To Provide For The Transfer Of Personal Property To The Coahoma Community College District; To Provide For The Status Of Students And Diplomas; In The Event Of Disapproval By The State Board Of Education To Provide For The Closure Of Coahoma Agricultural High School; To Provide For The Transfer Of Real Property To The Coahoma Community College District; To Provide For The Transfer Of Personal Property To The Coahoma Community College District; To Provide For The Status Of Students And Diplomas; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Coahoma Agriculture High School; provide for closure and transfer of facilities, equipment and students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 82 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 82 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Roberson,Barker |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Hopson,Jordan |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Moore, Roberson) |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-25 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Education |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Amended |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Education |