MS SB2511 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 79-4-4.02, 79-11-159, 79-14-103 And 79-29-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Renewable Name Reservation And To Extend The Name Reservation Period; To Amend Sections 79-4-1.22, 79-11-109, 79-14-1104 And 79-29-1203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Fee Sections For Business Corporations, Nonprofit Corporations, Limited Partnerships And Limited Liability Companies; To Repeal Sections 79-4-4.03 And 79-11-161, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Registration Of Corporate Names; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Name reservation and registration for corporations; revise.
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-06 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: BF To AC |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |