MS SB2521 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-14, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Public Entities To Enter Into Energy Performance Contracts And Shared Savings Contracts For Energy Efficiency Equipment And Services Relation To The Installation, Operation And Maintenance Of Equipment; To Revise The Definition Of The Terms "energy Services" Or "energy Efficient Services" To Include Alternative Fuel Motor Vehicles; To Revise The Term Of Lease-purchase Agreements For Energy Efficiency Services Or Equipment As Well As The Terms Of Shared Savings, Energy Services Contract And Energy Performance Contracts; To Amend Sections 31-7-73, 37-7-301, 37-29-67 And 37-101-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public contracts for energy efficiency services; authorize entities to enter into energy performance and shared-savings contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AC To EN |
2014-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPAA: EN To AC |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Energy;S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |