MS SB2528 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-5-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Contractors Who Submit Bids For Certain Public Works Projects That Utilize Funds Received By State Or Local Governmental Entities Resulting From A Federally Declared Disaster Or A Spill Of National Significance To Certify That They Will Comply With The Provisions Of This Section If They Are Awarded Such Contracts; To Provide That The Contractor Shall Submit To The Agency Or Governing Authority That Solicited The Bid And The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security An Employment Plan Within Seven Days After The Award Of The Contract; To Provide That From The Date Written Notice Of The Contract Award Is Received And Until Ten Business Days After The Receipt Of The Employment Plan By The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security, The Contractor And Any Subcontractor Shall Not Hire Any Personnel To Fill Vacant Positions Necessary For The Public Works Project Except Residents Of The State Of Mississippi Who Are To Be Verified By The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security And/or Those Qualified Individuals Who Are Submitted By The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security; To Provide That The Contract Award Shall Be Vacated If The Contractor Fails To Comply With Certain Provisions Of This Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Federal disaster; revise provision regarding hiring by a contractor awarded public works bid using funds from.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Sean Tindell [R] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lane, Eure, Guice) |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |