MS SB2554 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Revise And Clarify The "mississippi Accountability And Transparency Act Of 2008"; To Create New Section 27-104-152, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Declare Legislative Findings And Intent Regarding Public Access To The Details On State Expenditures Of Tax Dollars And Other State Funds And The Performance Results That Are Achieved For The Expenditures; To Amend Section 27-104-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Additional Terms Used Under The Act; To Amend Section 27-104-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Data That Is Required To Be Maintained On The Searchable Website Of The Department Of Finance And Administration That Includes Information On Expenditures Of State Funds And To Prescribe Additional Requirements For The Website; To Provide That The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning Shall Create The Ihl Accountability And Transparency Website No Later Than July 1, 2012; To Provide That The State Board For Community And Junior Colleges Shall Create The Community And Junior College Accountability And Transparency Website No Later Than July 1, 2012; To Amend Section 27-104-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Agencies To Provide The Department With Access To All Required Data Within 14 Days After The Data Becomes Available To The Agency; To Create New Section 27-104-158, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The State Auditor To Examine Agencies' Compliance With The Requirements Of The Act; To Amend Section 27-104-159, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Expenditures Of The Legislative Branch Shall Be Subject To The Provisions Of The Act; To Amend Section 25-61-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Accountability and Transparency Act"; define data to be maintained on searchable website.
Sponsors
Rep. David Baria [D] | Sen. Billy Hewes [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-22 | Conferees Named Stringer,Brown,Dedeaux | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Brown,Clarke,Collins | |
2011-03-09 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-07 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Fees, Salaries and Administration |