MS SB2620 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That In The Montgomery County And Winona Municipal Separate School Districts There Shall Be An Administrative Consolidation Into One School District To Be Designated As The Montgomery-winona School District Effective July 1, 2016; To Provide For The Composition Of The Board Of Education Of The New Montgomery-winona School District; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Administratively Consolidate Any School District Which Does Not Voluntarily Follow The Consolidation Order; To Abolish The Former School Districts Following The Administrative Consolidation And Provide For The Transfer Of School District Assets And Liabilities; To Provide For Execution Of Teacher And School District Employee Contracts And The Preparation Of A School District Budget In The New School District; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Promulgate Regulations To Implement Such Administrative Consolidation; To Provide A Two-year Waiver From Accountability And State Assessment Requirements For The New Student Population; To Amend Section 37-7-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district consolidation; require in Montgomery County and Winona.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Barker,Guice |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Collins,Carmichael |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Clark, Moore, Clarke) |
2014-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Education |