MS SB2682 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 37-159-1, 37-159-5, 37-159-7, 37-159-9, 37-159-11, 37-159-13 And 37-159-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Constitute The Mississippi Critical Teacher Shortage Act Of 1998 And Include The University Assisted Teacher Recruitment And Retention Grant Program, The Mississippi Employer-assisted Housing Teacher Program, And A Pilot Program To Provide For The Construction Of Rental Housing For Teachers In The West Tallahatchie School District; To Amend Section 37-159-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Mississippi Critical Teacher Shortage Act Of 1998; To Amend Section 37-106-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Award Criteria Of The William F. Winter And Jack Reed, Sr., Teacher Loan Repayment Program; To Provide That The State Financial Aid Board Shall Develop Rules For Ensuring That Expenses Of The Program In A Fiscal Year Do Not Exceed Funding For The Program In That Fiscal Year; To Provide That The State Financial Aid Board May Limit The Acceptance Of Applications And May Limit The Number Of Awards; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Critical Teacher Shortage Act of 1998; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2024-04-17 | House | Conferees Named Roberson,McCarty,Owen |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Blount,Parker |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED |
2024-03-21 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations A |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-29 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 106 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 159 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |