MS SB2737 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For The Step Therapy Or Fail-first Protocols By A Prescribing Practitioner Under Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Step therapy or fail-first protocols by a prescribing practitioner under certain circumstances; provide for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-22 | Conferees Named Holland,Read,Howell | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Bryan,Burton,Clarke | |
2011-03-14 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-07 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-04 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-09 | Amended | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |