MS SB2766 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 97-3-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Crime Of Indecent Assault; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Indecent assault; create crime of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |