MS SB2790 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-47-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "active Supervision" To Include Review Of Existing Regulations; To Amend Section 73-47-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Occupational Licensing Review Commission To Exercise Active Supervision Over Existing Occupational Regulations Promulgated By Occupational Licensing Boards; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Occupational Licensing Review Commission; authorize active supervision over existing occupational regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Polk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-16 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AC To JA |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JA To AC |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary A;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: BF To AC |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |