MS SB2813 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-49-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Change The Period For Issuance Of An Amusement Ride Operating Permit Decal From 12 Months To A Calendar Year; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Amusement rides; change period for operating permit decals from 12 months to calendar year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Finance |