MS SB2821 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-3-705, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Definitions As Used In The Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act; To Expand The Definition Of "telephone Solicitation" To Include Text Message Communications, Solicitations Of A Charitable Contribution, And Solicitations Of Items Of Value Regardless Of Whether A Sales Presentation Is Made; To Amend Section 77-3-711, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 77-3-725, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Civil Penalties For Violations Of The Act; To Amend Section 77-3-737, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Repealer On The Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act; revise to include text messages and solicitations for charitable contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Doty [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Charles Younger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Beckett,Bounds,Steverson |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Doty,Harkins,Polk |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Beckett, Steverson) |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EN To AC |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |