MS SB2836 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 31-7-103 And 31-7-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Acquisition Cost Of An Item Or Service Purchased By A County That Requires A Requisition To Purchase, Purchase Order And Receiving Report; And For Related Purposes.
Title
County purchases; increase the minimum acquisition costs of items and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Byrd,Sullivan,Tullos |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Younger,Moran,Seymour |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-08 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To County Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs |