MS SB2967 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Marion In Lauderdale County, Mississippi, To Expand Its Water And Sewer System Within A Certain Distance Outside The Corporate Limits Of The Town Of Marion; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Marion; authorize the expansion of the town's water and sewer system for a distance of not more than 15 miles outside the town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed |
2016-04-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |