MS SB3009 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Conferees Named Oliver,Read,Scoggin
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Conferees Named Oliver,Read,Scoggin
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Mississippi Agricultural And Forestry Experiment Station For Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - Mississippi State University - Agricultural and Forestry Experiment Station.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Oliver,Read,Scoggin |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Parks,DeLano |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A4 |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A4 To AP |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations E;Appropriations A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |