MS SB3019 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Commission On Judicial Performance Of The State Of Mississippi For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Judicial Performance Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Rod Hickman [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Read,Cockerham |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Norwood |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A3 |
2024-04-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A3 To AP |
2024-03-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations D;Appropriations A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |