MS SB3057 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Gaming Commission, For Fiscal Year 2012.
Title
Appropriation; Gaming Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Merle Flowers [R] |
Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 94 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Davis,Flowers,Montgomery | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Stringer,Flaggs,Hines | |
2011-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-02-25 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-02-24 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2011-02-18 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-17 | Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Appropriations |