MS SB3140 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Gautier, Mississippi, To Enter Into A Public And Private Partnership With Unlimited Play, Inc., For The Construction Of An Inclusion Playground; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Gautier; authorize to enter into public/private partnership for construction of an inclusion playground.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed |
2023-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |