MS SC510 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life And Public Contributions Of Luster Bayless Of Ruleville, Mississippi, Legendary Costumer To John Wayne And Founder Of United American Costume Company, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature On His Passing.
Title
Mourn the loss and commend the life of Luster Bayless, legendary Costumer to John Wayne.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-07 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |