MS SC526 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Former United States Senator Trent Lott Of Pascagoula, Mississippi, Upon His Induction Into The University Of Mississippi Alumni Association 2010 Hall Of Fame.
Title
Commend former U.S. Senator Trent Lott for induction into University of Mississippi Alumni Association 2010 Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-19 | Adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-13 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-01-13 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-13 | Adopted | |
2011-01-12 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-10 | Referred To Rules |