MS SC527 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Jackson Academy "raiders" Football Team And Head Coach David Sykes For Winning Their Second Consecutive Mississippi Association Of Independent Schools Class Aaa State Championship.
Title
Commend Jackson Academy "Raiders" Football Team and Coach David Sykes for winning second consecutive Class AAA State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-19 | Adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-13 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-01-13 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-13 | Adopted | |
2011-01-12 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-10 | Referred To Rules |