MS SC533 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting The Legislative Members Of Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc., And Designating March 12, 2024, As "kappa Day At The State Kapitol" And Congratulating Former Senator Kenny Wayne Jones As The Political Action Chairman Of The Mighty Southwestern Province.
Title
Recognize legislative members of Kappa Alpha Psi and designate March 12, 2024, as "Kappa Day at the State Kapitol."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |