MS SC563 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Expressing The Intent Of The Legislature That Mississippi Shall Commit To Become An "employment First" State Relative To Persons With Disabilities.
Title
Mississippi shall commit to become an "Employment First" State relative to persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |