MS SC617 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Endorsing The Posthumous Award Of Military Decorations To Union Lieutenant Albert Westinghouse, Veteran Of The Battle Of Mcleod's Mill On December 10, 1864, In Leakesville, Mississippi.
Title
Urge Posthumous Award of Military Decorations to Union Lieutenant Albert Westinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |