MS SC632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating March 20, 2018, As "undergraduate Research Day In Mississippi" To Emphasize The Value Of Scholarly Inquiry And The Application Of Research To The Education Of Future Leaders And To Recognize The "posters In The Rotunda" Project.
Title
Designate March 20, 2018, as "Undergraduate Research Day in Mississippi" and recognize "Posters in the Rotunda" project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |