MS SC635 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The East Webster High School "wolverines" Cheerleading Squad And Coach Shawna Williams For Winning Their Third Consecutive Mhsaa Class 1a Through 3a Non-tumbling State Championship.
Title
Commend East Webster High School Cheerleading Team for third consecutive State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |