MS SC637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Contributions Made By Dr. Claude Brunson To Health Care In Mississippi On The Occasion Of His Retirement As Senior Advisor For External Affairs To The Vice-chancellor At The University Of Mississippi Medical Center (ummc), Clinical Professor Of Anesthesiology At Ummc And Past President Of The Mississippi State Medical Association.
Title
Recognize contributions made by Dr. Claude Brunson to Health Care in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |