MS SC646 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting Samantha Golden Of Meridian As Miss Rodeo Mississippi 2012.
Title
Recognize Samantha Golden as Miss Rodeo Mississippi 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-20 | Adopted | |
2012-04-13 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-11 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-10 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-10 | Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Referred To Rules |