MS SC663 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Achievements Of University Of Southern Mississippi Athletic Director Richard Giannini On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize USM Director of Athletics Richard Giannini on his retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Billy Hudson [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-03 | Adopted | |
2012-04-26 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-25 | Adopted | |
2012-04-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-19 | Referred To Rules |