MS SC672 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Suspending The Deadlines For The Purpose Of Requesting The Drafting, Introduction, Consideration And Passage, Of A Bill Entitled "an Act To Create A New Section To Be Codified As Section 1-3-24, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "intellectual Disability" When Used In Any Statute; To Amend Sections 1-3-57, 1-3-58, 11-5-49, 11-5-113, 25-3-25, 25-7-61, 35-5-31, 37-3-85, 37-16-11, 37-23-3, 37-23-61, 37-23-63, 37-23-91, 37-101-285, 37-143-13, 41-4-1, 41-4-5, 41-4-7, 41-4-8, 41-4-11, 41-4-23, 41-5-44, 41-19-1, 41-19-7, 41-19-15, 41-19-17, 41-19-31, 41-19-33, 41-19-37, 41-19-38, 41-19-39, 41-19-41, 41-19-43, 41-19-91, 41-19-103, 41-19-116, 41-19-118, 41-19-141, 41-19-147, 41-19-155, 41-19-157, 41-19-201, 41-19-203, 41-19-205, 41-19-207, 41-19-211, 41-19-213, 41-19-231, 41-19-235, 41-19-237, 41-19-239, 41-19-243, 41-19-245, 41-19-301, 41-21-35, 41-21-61, 41-21-67, 41-21-69, 41-21-73, 41-21-77, 41-21-82, 41-21-83, 41-21-87, 41-21-103, 41-21-109, 41-39-7, 43-6-171, 43-13-105, 43-17-5, 43-21-105, 43-27-25, 73-19-23, 83-41-205, 83-41-207, 93-1-5, 93-5-1, 97-9-25, 99-13-1, 99-13-3, 99-13-5 And 99-13-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Modernize The Terminology That Is Used To Refer To Persons With Mental Retardation And The Commissions And Facilities That Provide Treatment And Care To Those Persons, By Referring To Them As Persons With An Intellectual Disability; And For Related Purposes."
Title
Suspend deadlines for introduction; mental health; modernize terminology used to refer to persons with mental retardation.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Billy Hewes [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Tom King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Recommitted to Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Referred To Rules |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/history/SC/SC0672.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2010/html/SC/SC0672IN.htm |