MS SC674 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Elizabeth Phillips, New Hope High School Senior Of Columbus, Mississippi, Upon Her Receipt Of The 2015 Prudential Spirit Of Community Award As A Distinguished Finalist.
Title
Commend Elizabeth Phillips for winning the 2015 Mississippi Prudential Spirit of Community Award as Distinguished Finalist.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred To Rules |