MS SC681 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Career Of Hinds County Justice Court Judge Clyde R. Chapman Of Terry, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of Completing Seven Terms Of Public Service.
Title
Recognize Hinds County Justice Court Judge Clyde Chapman for his public service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-31 | Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-30 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-30 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-30 | Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Referred To Rules |