MS SC682 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Death Of Pearl Police Investigator Mike Walter Who Was Lost In The Line Of Duty On May 1, 2012.
Title
Mourn the loss of Pearl Police Investigator Mike Walter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-03 | Adopted | |
2012-05-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-05-03 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-05-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-03 | Adopted | |
2012-05-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Referred To Rules |