MS SC687 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Joining The City Of Natchez In Celebrating The 200th Anniversary Of Natchez Children's Services.
Title
Celebrate the 200th Anniversary of Natchez Children's Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |