ND 2021 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the information technology department; to provide appropriations to certain agencies for an electronic payment processing system; to authorize borrowing authority; to provide for transfers; to provide for a report; to create and enact sections 15-19-01.1 and 15-19-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the centers for distance education; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 37-17.3-02.2, section 54-59-31, and subsection 1 of section 54-59-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statewide interoperability executive committee, certified electronic health information systems, and the statewide longitudinal data system; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The statewide interoperability executive committee, certified electronic health information systems, and the statewide longitudinal data system; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateSigned by Governor 04/25
2017-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 67 nays 24
2017-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-12HouseConference committee appointed Nathe Boehning Brabandt
2017-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Wanzek Hogue Robinson
2017-04-10SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-10SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-10HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 64 nays 28
2017-04-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 3 2
2017-03-17HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-05SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback