CA SB1161 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 851.7 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 303, 388, 450, 451, 604, 653.5, 654.2, 781, 786, 786.5, 800, and 827 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3448.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3351.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 851.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 653.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 654.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 781 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 786.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |