ND SB2076 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 26.1-10.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to corporate governance; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Corporate governance; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 9 |
2019-03-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |