ND HB1010 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the insurance commissioner; to provide an appropriation for the distribution of funds from the insurance tax distribution fund; to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to examinations of health carriers; to amend and reenact section 26.1-01-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the insurance commissioner; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for a report.
Title
The salary of the insurance commissioner; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide for a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2021-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Oehlke Erbele Davison |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Meier Bellew Mock |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |