ND HB1045 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-01-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a life safety survey process of any health care facility licensed by the department of health and human services.
Title
A life safety survey process of any health care facility licensed by the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:35 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:40 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:40 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:17 |
2023-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 03:20 |
2023-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |