ND HB1052 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 009 nays 082
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 009 nays 082
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the adjutant general for phase two of the department of emergency services' computer-aided dispatch system.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the adjutant general for phase two of the department of emergency services' computer-aided dispatch system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-21 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 009 nays 082 | |
2009-01-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1052.html |