ND HB1151 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 65-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reporting requirements in safety grant programs; to amend and reenact subsection 31 of section 65-01-02 and sections 65-01-13, 65-03-04, and 65-04-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definition of wages, information fund, safety grant awards, and confidentiality of employer files for workforce safety and insurance purposes; and to repeal section 65-03-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rules for mine foremen.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 65-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reporting requirements in safety grant programs; to amend and reenact subsection 31 of section 65-01-02 and sections 65-01-13, 65-03-04, and 65-04-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definition of wages, information fund, safety grant awards, and confidentiality of employer files for workforce safety and insurance purposes; and to repeal section 65-03-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rules for mine foremen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-20 | Appointed Boe to replace Thorpe on conf comm | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Andrist Nodland Potter | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Nottestad N. Johnson Thorpe | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-18 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-03-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1151.html |