ND HB1154 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 6-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions for the department of financial institutions.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 6-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions for the department of financial institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-05 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-03 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-02 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 089 nays 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1154.html |