ND HB1296 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 53-06.1-03 and subsection 2 of section 53-06.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval for a gaming site authorization and modification of allowable expense limits.
Title
Approval for a gaming site authorization and modification of allowable expense limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 42 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 05:25 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 8 |
2023-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:50 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-01 | House | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2023-02-01 | House | Request return from committee |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |