ND HB1305 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-21-02.10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to incorporating additional and different requirements for the North Dakota scholarship.
Title
Incorporating additional and different requirements for the North Dakota scholarship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-17 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5 |
2023-01-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 11:27 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |