ND HB1309 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Krebsbach, Nelson, Wardner A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Krebsbach, Nelson, Wardner A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-09 | Received from House | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 001 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1309.html |